NH SB72 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0037; Effective 05/09/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0037; Effective 05/09/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study certain investments by municipalities.
Title
Establishing a committee to study certain investments by municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0037; Effective 05/09/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 8 |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 6 |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/06/2017 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 04/04/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 10 P. 76 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0574s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0574s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0574s, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |