NH SB72 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0032
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0032
Summary
Consolidating cemetery boards of trustees in Nashua.
Title
Consolidating cemetery boards of trustees in Nashua.
Sponsors
Rep. David Campbell [D] | Rep. Jane Clemons [D] | Rep. David Cote [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Rep. Pamela Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0032 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-05 | House Enrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1658 | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 21 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1527 | |
2010-03-31 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 3/30/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 18, PG.1017 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 3, Pg.44 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0136s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 3, Pg.39 | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 0136s Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-01-13 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass with Amendment 0136s, 1/21/10; Senate Calendar 3 Pg. 2 | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.106 | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Report; Rereferred to Committee [3/11/09]; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2009-01-28 | Senate Hearing; February 3, 2009, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2009-01-08 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2, Pg.25 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=978&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |