NH SB71 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Remote Hearing: 01/26/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to develop science-based emissions reduction goals for the state of New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to develop science-based emissions reduction goals for the state of New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateRemote Hearing: 01/26/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback