NH SB71 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB71
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the election of delegates to party conventions.
Title
Relative to the election of delegates to party conventions.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 40 |
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 8 |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-08-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/03/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-05-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 12:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB71 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)