NH SB71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB71
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the law governing alimony.
Title
Relative to the law governing alimony.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] | Rep. Mary Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | I. Section 6 Effective 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0310 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1944c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1944c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1944c Filed 05/17/2018; Senate Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/08/2018, 01:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2018-04-26 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. K. Rice, Itse, Spencer, Walz 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Lasky; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2518h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 28 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2518h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 28 |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2518h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-09-19 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-06-07 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-05-17 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/06/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-05-03 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-04-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/04/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 10 P. 76 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0767s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-0767s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0767s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB71 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2518h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)