NH SB71 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2013; Chapter 0161; Effective 06/28/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2013; Chapter 0161; Effective 06/28/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the use and misuse of prescription drugs in workers' compensation cases.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the use and misuse of prescription drugs in workers' compensation cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2013; Chapter 0161; Effective 06/28/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Concur with House Amendment 1228h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1228h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 193-145; House Journal 38, PG.1244 |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment #1228h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1244 |
2013-04-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar33, PG.1096 |
2013-04-17 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-1228h; House Calendar33, PG.1112 |
2013-04-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1228h for April 24 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1096 |
2013-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0203s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0203s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0203s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:10 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |