NH SB71 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-29 - Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 10/18/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to health care fees in workers' compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to health care fees in workers' compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-29 Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 10/18/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 40
2011-03-09 Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.84
2011-02-25 Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14
2011-02-17 Senate Hearing: 2/25/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12
2011-02-03 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 5, Pg.44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback