NH SB7 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the secure modern accurate registration act (SMART ACT).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the secure modern accurate registration act (SMART ACT).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-11-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2712h (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-04HouseExecutive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-09-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-08-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-24HouseRetained in Committee
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1157s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Carson Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1157s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1157s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0849s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0849s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0849s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-13SenateHearing: 02/20/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=890&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB7
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=892&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=892
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=892
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=59&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=890
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=112&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=890
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=113&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=890

Bill Comments

feedback