NH SB7 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to eligibility for food stamps and establishing the Granite Workforce pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to eligibility for food stamps and establishing the Granite Workforce pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Sections 3 - 11 (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Bradley Floor Amendment 1189s (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Rerefer (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 0898s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Lay on the Table (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-01HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-10-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-09-05HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-08-15HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/31/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-25HouseRetained in Committee
2017-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/12/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 27
2017-03-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1189s; Motion Adopted, OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSections 3 through 11, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N; Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSections 1, 2 and 11, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N; Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateThe Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/30/2017 Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSen. Feltes Moved to divide the Question on SB 7-FN-L: Sections 1, 2 and 11, and Sections 3 through 11; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-1189s, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Suspend Senate Rule 3-17; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateSen. Feltes Objected to the Suspension of Senate Rule 3-17; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateWithout Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment #2017-1189s; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateChair Ruled Sections of Amendment #2017-1189s Non-Germane, 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateSen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment #2017-1189s; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateSen. Avard Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-09-29SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-29SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-29SenateSpecial Order SB 7-FN-L to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11
2017-03-23SenateSpecial Order SB 7-FN-L to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-16SenateHearing: 03/21/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment #2017-0929s; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-0898s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-0898s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateSen. Birdsell moved to call the question, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017 Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateSen. Woodburn Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateSen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment #2017-0898s; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-0790s, Division Vote 0Y-16N, Amendment Failed; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0790s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14
2017-02-16SenateHearing: 02/21/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2017-02-08Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 02/13/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=920&sy=2017&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2017&id=922&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=53&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=920
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=54&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=920
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=55&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=920
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=87&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=920
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=88&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=920
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=89&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=920
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=90&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0007&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB7&ddlsponsors=&lsr=920

Bill Comments

feedback