NH SB692 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain costs of the public utilities commission for participation in regional activities.
Title
Relative to certain costs of the public utilities commission for participation in regional activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1038s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1038s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1038s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |