NH SB69 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring employers to provide access to a sufficient space for nursing mothers and reasonable break time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring employers to provide access to a sufficient space for nursing mothers and reasonable break time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0111s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0111s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
2021-10-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2021-08-17HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2021-05-24HouseRetained in Committee
2021-05-05HouseExecutive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643
2021-03-17HousePublic Hearing: 03/30/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99157160886 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48
2021-02-04SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0111s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0111s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3
2021-01-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0111s, 02/04/2021; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-20SenateRemote Hearing: 01/26/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=861&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB69
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=852&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=852
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=20&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0069&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB69&ddlsponsors=&lsr=861
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=21&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0069&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB69&ddlsponsors=&lsr=861
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=20&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0069&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB69&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0861
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=21&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0069&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB69&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0861

Bill Comments

feedback