NH SB688 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the pricing of generic prescription drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the pricing of generic prescription drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseIntroduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-03-12SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1065s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-12SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this Body: Rescind Order to Third Reading and Final Passage, and Reconsider the Vote on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1065s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
2020-03-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1065s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1065s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10
2020-01-16SenateHearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 3
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback