NH SB68 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0035; Effective 07/08/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0035; Effective 07/08/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sentencing for violations of probation.
Title
Relative to sentencing for violations of probation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/09/2017; Chapter 0035; Effective 07/08/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 4 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/22/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |