NH SB679 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring institutions of higher education to adopt policies on sexual misconduct.
Title
Requiring institutions of higher education to adopt policies on sexual misconduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1199s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Floor Amendment # 2020-1199s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1046s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1046s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2020, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |