NH SB673 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recovery of unauthorized payments by the state.
Title
Relative to recovery of unauthorized payments by the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/19/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-03-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-02-25 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:40 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |