NH SB67 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0199; Effective 09/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0199; Effective 09/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of state police employees.
Title
Relative to the authority of state police employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0199; Effective 09/03/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1737h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 136 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1737h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 136 |
2017-05-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-05-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1737h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 16 |
2017-05-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/16/2017 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-26 | House | Public Hearing: 05/02/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 4 |
2017-03-30 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2017 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/09/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 10 P. 76 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0765s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0765s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0765s, 03/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |