NH SB67 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2013; Chapter 0128; Effective 06/25/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2013; Chapter 0128; Effective 06/25/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to examine the issue of statutory authority for all terrain vehicles, off highway recreational vehicles, and low speed utility vehicles to access public highways for food, fuel, and lodging.
Title
Establishing a committee to examine the issue of statutory authority for all terrain vehicles, off highway recreational vehicles, and low speed utility vehicles to access public highways for food, fuel, and lodging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2013; Chapter 0128; Effective 06/25/2013 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 49, PG.1648 |
2013-05-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1520 |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 29 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar40, PG.1374 |
2013-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-04-08 | House | Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |