NH SB66 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 224-125 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 224-125 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political contributions by candidates for certain offices.
Title
Relative to political contributions by candidates for certain offices.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. Barbara Griffin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 224-125 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 57 |
2019-05-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-05-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 13 |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1046s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1046s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1046s, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |