NH SB66 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-3020s, New Title, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-3020s, New Title, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Naming the lobby of the legislative office building after former speaker of the house George Roberts.
Title
Naming the lobby of the legislative office building after former speaker of the house George Roberts.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. John Tholl [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] |
Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-3020s, New Title, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 6 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Sen. D’Allesandro Moved to Remove SB 66 from the Consent Calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Special Order SB 66 to 2/19/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/15, Room 100, State House, 2:05 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |