NH SB657 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the issuance of breast cancer awareness license plates.
Title
Authorizing the issuance of breast cancer awareness license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Tom Dolan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |