NH SB64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by the Governor on 04/17/2017; Chapter 0019; Effective 04/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by the Governor on 04/17/2017; Chapter 0019; Effective 04/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study medication synchronization.
Title
Establishing a committee to study medication synchronization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 04/17/2017; Chapter 0019; Effective 04/17/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 63 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1226e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 03/30/2017); Senate Journal 13 |
2017-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1226e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 26 |
2017-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2017 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2017 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |