NH SB63 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB63
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to business liability protection for exposure to coronavirus and COVID-19.
Title
Relative to business liability protection for exposure to coronavirus and COVID-19.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Moved to Remove SB63 from the Consent Calendar; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/08/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Remote Hearing: 02/01/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6