NH SB63 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB63
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - II. Remainder Effective 08/15/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - II. Remainder Effective 08/15/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sharing of insurer rebates with enrollees.
Title
Relative to sharing of insurer rebates with enrollees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 08/15/2020 |
2020-07-17 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 07/01/2024 |
2020-07-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/17/2020; Chapter 0015 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2794h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 65 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2794h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 65 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2794h (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 |
2019-10-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-10-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-08-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-05-29 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-05-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1209s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1209s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2794h (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar)