NH SB63 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2011; Effective 09/03/2011; Chapter 0236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2011; Effective 09/03/2011; Chapter 0236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the list of bail bondsmen and prohibiting law enforcement and corrections officers from indicating preferences for bail bond companies.
Title
Relative to the list of bail bondsmen and prohibiting law enforcement and corrections officers from indicating preferences for bail bond companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2011; Effective 09/03/2011; Chapter 0236 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-2514e, New Title, Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2514e(NT) Adopted; House Journal 51, PG.1728 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Houde Concurs with House Amendment #1600h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.551 | |
2011-05-25 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1600h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1580 | |
2011-05-25 | House Amendment #1600h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1580 | |
2011-05-18 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1600h; House Calendar 41, PG.1407 | |
2011-05-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1600h for May 25 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 41, PG.1392 | |
2011-05-10 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-04-26 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/3/2011 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-04-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/26/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-04-12 | House Public Hearing: 4/19/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0799s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.185 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0799s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.185 | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0799s, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Hearing: 2/3/2011, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34 |