NH SB623 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring insurance coverage for PFAS and PFC blood tests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring insurance coverage for PFAS and PFC blood tests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-06-30HouseIntroduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5
2020-03-11SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
2020-03-11SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider the vote on: Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
2020-03-11SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10
2020-02-13SenateHearing: 02/18/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback