NH SB592 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1452h (NT) 04/09/2024 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1452h (NT) 04/09/2024 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming Route 127 from Central Street in Franklin to the town line of Sanbornton as Officer Bradley Haas Memorial Highway.
Title
Renaming Route 127 from Central Street in Franklin to the town line of Sanbornton as Officer Bradley Haas Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1452h (NT) 04/09/2024 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) |
2024-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/09/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/11/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Special Order to The beginning of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 3 |