NH SB580 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - V. Remainder shall take effect 06/06/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - V. Remainder shall take effect 06/06/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transfers of appropriated funds, amending a capital budget appropriation to allow for door replacements at the New Hampshire hospital, and transferring a capital budget appropriation for painting the ceiling of Representatives Hall to the legislative branch.
Title
Relative to transfers of appropriated funds, amending a capital budget appropriation to allow for door replacements at the New Hampshire hospital, and transferring a capital budget appropriation for painting the ceiling of Representatives Hall to the legislative branch.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | V. Remainder shall take effect 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | IV. Section 10 shall take effect 06/30/2019 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | III. Section 3 shall take effect 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | II. RSA 9:16-a, II-a (c)-(d) as inserted in section 2, shall take effect 04/01/2019 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | I. RSA 9:16-a, II-a (a)-(b) as inserted in section 2, shall take effect 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2018; Chapter 0163 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2120e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2120e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2075c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2075c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2075c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-16 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2018, 11:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2018-05-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Jack Replaces Rep. Cloutier 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 12:30 pm, Room 103, State House ==RECESSED== |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. McConkey, Milz, L. Ober, Cloutier 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Daniels, Giuda, Feltes; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved Reconsideration on the Concur vote, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1725h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment # 2018-1725h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1725h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 22 |
2018-04-19 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/18/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 8 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1327h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 7 |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendment # 2018-1327h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 7 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1327h (NT) for 04/12/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6 |
2018-04-04 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment # 2018-1252h: 04/03/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-03-22 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-1184h: 03/27/2018 01:20 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/27/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0506s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0506s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0506s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:05 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-0367s; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2 |