NH SB58 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Sen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to payment for low-dose mammography coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to payment for low-dose mammography coverage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2177h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-06-05HouseAmendment # 2019-2177h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2177h (NT) for 06/05/2019 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 10
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-01HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-17House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/25/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/25/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback