NH SB579 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to court ordered batterers intervention programs.
Title
Relative to court ordered batterers intervention programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Rep. Zoe Manos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9A |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |