NH SB579 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2018; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/18/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to penalties for welfare fraud.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to penalties for welfare fraud.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/18/2018; Chapter 0277; Effective 06/18/2018
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 16
2018-04-05HouseReferred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 4
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 4
2018-03-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 4
2018-03-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 53
2018-02-15SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7
2018-01-23SenateHearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 5
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback