NH SB57 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to phasing out and repealing the utility property tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to phasing out and repealing the utility property tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback