NH SB57 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - II. Remainder Effective 07/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making appropriations to the department of environmental services for the purposes of funding eligible drinking water and wastewater projects under the state aid grant program and relative to making an appropriation from the drinking water and groundwater trust fund to the department of environmental services to address drinking water contamination in Amherst.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations to the department of environmental services for the purposes of funding eligible drinking water and wastewater projects under the state aid grant program and relative to making an appropriation from the drinking water and groundwater trust fund to the department of environmental services to address drinking water contamination in Amherst.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - Senate - Lay on the Table (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/10/2017
2017-07-12SenateI. Section 5 Effective 07/01/2017
2017-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/10/2017; Chapter 0207
2017-06-22SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-22HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23
2017-06-08SenateSen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-01HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 122
2017-06-01HouseAmendment #2017-2021h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 121
2017-05-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2021h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 14
2017-05-10HouseExecutive Session: 05/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-05-10HouseDivision I Work Session: 05/16/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-05-03HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2017-1593h: 05/09/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-05-03HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2017-1534h: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-05-03HouseDivision I Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-04-12HouseDivision I Work Session: 04/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/11/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Finance House Journal 11 P. 27
2017-03-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1192s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-1192s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider SB 57-FN-A: Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-31SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-02-09SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
2017-02-09SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 13Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
2017-02-09SenateThe Chair rescinded OT3rdg, 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
2017-02-09SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
2017-02-09SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 02/09/2017 Senate Journal 5
2017-02-09SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
2017-01-27SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-19SenateHearing: 01/24/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback