NH SB57 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the membership and governance of condominium unit owners associations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the membership and governance of condominium unit owners associations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18HouseConference Committee Report; Not Signed Off
2015-06-16SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: === RECONVENE === 6/17/2015, 10:00 a.m., Room 103, Legislative Office Building
2015-06-11HouseConferee Change: Rep Jones Replaces Rep Hurt; House Journal 46, PG. 1990
2015-06-11SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 6/16/2015, 1:45 p.m., Room 103, Legislative Office Building === RECESSED ===
2015-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Williams, French, Hurt (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954
2015-06-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954
2015-06-04SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Stiles, Prescott, Soucy
2015-06-04SenateSen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1644h, New Title; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17
2015-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1644h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1817-1822
2015-06-03HouseAmendment #1644h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1817-1822
2015-05-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1644h (NT) for Jun 3 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Journal 39, PG. 1628
2015-05-13HouseExecutive Session: 5/19/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-04-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-04-01HousePublic Hearing: 4/8/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-03-31HouseIntroduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1298
2015-03-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1011s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-26SenateCommittee Amendment 1011s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2015-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1011s, 3/26/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2015-02-20SenateHearing: === RESCHEDULED === 3/2/15, Room 100, State House, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11
2015-01-29SenateHearing:===CANCELLED=== 2/17/15, Room 100, State House, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback