NH SB57 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - II. Remainder Effective 04/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to approval of the project proposed by the Town of Alstead for the lower Warren Brook Restoration project, establishing a commission to determine the appropriate use of flood damaged property, and repealing a commission established in 2006 to determine the appropriate use of property damaged in the October 2005 floods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to approval of the project proposed by the Town of Alstead for the lower Warren Brook Restoration project, establishing a commission to determine the appropriate use of flood damaged property, and repealing a commission established in 2006 to determine the appropriate use of property damaged in the October 2005 floods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01SenateII. Remainder Effective 04/01/13
2013-04-01SenateI. Section 3 Effective 11/01/13
2013-04-01SenateSigned by the Governor on 04/01/13; Chapter 0007
2013-03-27SenateEnrolled
2013-03-27HouseEnrolled; House Journal 31, PG.1039
2013-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2013-0936e Adopted
2013-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #0936e Adopted; House Journal 26, PG.828
2013-03-13HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.768
2013-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.511-512
2013-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-28HousePublic Hearing: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-27HouseIntroduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 24, PG.645
2013-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0239s, 0385s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5
2013-02-14SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-0385s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment 0239s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-02-14SenateSen. Bragdon Moved to Remove SB 57 from the Consent Calendar
2013-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0239s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2013-01-29SenateHearing: 2/6/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2013-01-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback