NH SB57 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Senate Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 57 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Veto Overridden by required two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 22, Pg.737
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to regulation of title loan lenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to regulation of title loan lenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-09-07 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - OTP (Y: 180 N: 171 NV: 45 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - FLAM 1549H(NT) (REP VAILLANCOURT) (Y: 134 N: 213 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-07 Senate Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 57 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Veto Overridden by required two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 22, Pg.737
2011-07-06 Senate Vetoed by Governor 07/06/2011, Senate Calendar 32
2011-05-04 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318
2011-05-04 House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490
2011-04-27 House Reconsideration (Rep Hunt): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1372
2011-04-27 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-171; House Journal 40, PG.1355-1361
2011-04-27 House Floor Amendment #2011-1549h(NT) (Rep Vaillancourt) Failed, Regular Calendar 134-213; House Journal 40, PG.1355-1359
2011-04-21 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 33, PG.1069
2011-04-21 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 27 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1069
2011-04-12 House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2011-04-12 House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 Banking/Business Div
2011-03-22 House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==Work Session May Follow==
2011-03-16 House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 28, Pg.882
2011-03-09 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99
2011-03-09 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0451s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.84
2011-03-09 Senate Committee Amendment 0451s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.84
2011-02-23 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0451s, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14
2011-01-26 Senate Hearing: 2/1/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9
2011-01-19 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=968&sy=2011&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2011/SB0057.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=166&sy=2011&lb=H&eb=SB0057&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=968
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=167&sy=2011&lb=H&eb=SB0057&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=968
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=5&sy=2011&lb=S&eb=SB0057&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=968
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=101&sy=2011&lb=S&eb=SB0057&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2011&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=968

Bill Comments 750

feedback