NH SB567 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the commissioner of the department of health and human services to compile a report on the availability of mifepristone and misoprostol.
Title
Directing the commissioner of the department of health and human services to compile a report on the availability of mifepristone and misoprostol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/24/2024 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar) |
2024-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-04-02 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-03-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/03/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0714s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2024-0714s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0541s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0541s, 02/15/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |