NH SB565 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to aircraft registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to aircraft registration fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 313 N: 16 NV: 31 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018
2018-06-26SenateI. Section 1-5 Effective 01/01/2019
2018-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/21/2018; Chapter 0287
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10SenateSen. Sanborn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1676h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 313-16 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseAmendment # 2018-1676h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1676h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 19-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 21
2018-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-19HouseDivision II Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-04-12House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-12HouseDivision II Work Session: 04/17/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-04-05HouseDivision II Work Session: 04/10/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 209
2018-04-05HouseReferred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 8
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1246h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 7
2018-04-05HouseAmendment # 2018-1246h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 7
2018-03-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1246h for 04/05/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6
2018-03-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-21HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 7 P. 54
2018-03-08SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 19Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-02-22SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 18Y-4N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8
2018-01-10SenateHearing: 01/17/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 3
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=3005&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB565
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=2021&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=2021
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=2021
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=63&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0565&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB565&ddlsponsors=&lsr=3005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=92&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0565&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB565&ddlsponsors=&lsr=3005
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=216&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0565&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB565&ddlsponsors=&lsr=3005

Bill Comments

feedback