NH SB563 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a recovery friendly workplace initiatives tax credit against business taxes administered by the community development finance authority.
Title
Establishing a recovery friendly workplace initiatives tax credit against business taxes administered by the community development finance authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202 |
2018-09-05 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-09-05 | House | ==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202 |
2018-04-05 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/05/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 8 P. 71 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-0787s, and 2018-0846s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment # 2018-0846s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0787s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0787s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/17/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 2 |