NH SB560 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a committee to study the impact of pharmacy benefit manager operations on cost, administration, and distribution of prescription drugs.
Title
Relative to establishing a committee to study the impact of pharmacy benefit manager operations on cost, administration, and distribution of prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Rep. David Rochefort [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/11/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0834s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0834s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0834s, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |