NH SB556 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - III. Remainder shall take effect 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to changes in bail procedures and procedures for annulment of a criminal record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to changes in bail procedures and procedures for annulment of a criminal record.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateIII. Remainder shall take effect 07/02/2018
2018-07-05SenateII. Section 12 Effective 11/01/2018
2018-07-05SenateI. Section 1-10 Effective 08/31/2018
2018-07-05SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0366
2018-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-06-11HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-06SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2122e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2122e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-2017c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 2017c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-17HouseConference Committee Report # 2018-2017c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment
2018-05-10SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 10:00 am, Room 100, State House
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Welch, Sapareto, Rodd, Cushing 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Feltes; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1253h and 1577h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 19
2018-04-19HouseFLAM # 2018-1577h (Rep. Welch): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 19
2018-04-19HouseAmendment # 2018-1253h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 18
2018-04-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1253h for 04/19/2018 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 11
2018-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 54
2018-03-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0958s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0958s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0958s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-16SenateHearing: 01/23/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 4
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback