NH SB55 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2019; Chapter 0139; Effective 08/24/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Harris Center for Conservation Education to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Harris Center for Conservation Education to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/25/2019; Chapter 0139; Effective 08/24/2019
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1925e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1925e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 9
2019-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 7
2019-04-16HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/02/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:35 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback