NH SB55 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2550s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to backflow devices for water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relative to backflow devices for water.



2017-12-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2550s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
2017-03-16SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14
2017-01-19SenateHearing: 01/25/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 7
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments