NH SB546 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to purchasing alliances.
Title
Relative to purchasing alliances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-08-22 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building304 |
2018-04-26 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 263-66 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-04-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/26/2018 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 9 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/04/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0986s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0986s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0986s, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0986s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |