NH SB543 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2016; Chapter 0159; Effective 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2016; Chapter 0159; Effective 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to private transferring of adopted children.
Title
Relative to private transferring of adopted children.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2016; Chapter 0159; Effective 07/01/2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/12/2016); Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-18 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 128 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1884e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1884e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 55 |
2016-04-20 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 10 |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 2 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 2 |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2016 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 6 |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0824s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0824s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/10/2016 Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0824s, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3 |