NH SB540 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0332; Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the operation of keno games in unincorporated places and permitting keno games in cigar bars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the operation of keno games in unincorporated places and permitting keno games in cigar bars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 247 N: 49 NV: 58 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1034 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0332; Effective 06/25/2018
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-2071c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 2071c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-17HouseConference Committee Report # 2018-2071c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the House
2018-05-16Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2018, 12:30 pm, Room 103, State House
2018-05-16HouseConferee Change: Rep. Packard Replaces Rep. Ohm 05/10/2018
2018-05-16SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 10:30 am, Room 103, State House ==RECESSED==
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, T. Wolf, Ohm, Martin 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. Ladd, Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Reagan, Giuda, D'Allesandro; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Daniels Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-26HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1518h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 247-49 04/26/2018
2018-04-26HouseAmendment # 2018-1518h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-04-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1518h (NT) for 04/26/2018 (Vote 21-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 15
2018-04-18HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-04-12HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-04-12HouseReferred to Ways and Means 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 3
2018-04-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1315h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 3
2018-04-12HouseAmendment # 2018-1315h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 3
2018-04-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1315h (NT) for 04/12/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4
2018-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 207
2018-03-21HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 207
2018-03-20HouseIntroduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 8 P. 70
2018-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-0980s and 2018-1101s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2018-1101s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1034s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0980s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0980s, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0980s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-16SenateHearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2790&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB540
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1806&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1806
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1806
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=1806
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=95&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0540&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB540&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2790
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=196&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0540&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB540&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2790

Bill Comments

feedback