NH SB540 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the possession, use, or sale of kratom by any person under 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the possession, use, or sale of kratom by any person under 18 years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-27HouseDied on Table
2016-05-11HouseLay on Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Adopted DV 202-143 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 56
2016-05-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 18
2016-04-27House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/03/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-04-20House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/26/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-04-06HousePublic Hearing: 04/13/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2016-03-29HouseIntroduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 27 P. 68
2016-03-17SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0856s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateCommittee Amendment 0856s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2016 Senate Journal 9
2016-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0856s, New Title, 03/17/2016; Senate Calendar 10
2016-03-10SenateSpecial Order SB 540 to 03/17/2016, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 8
2016-03-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0856s, New Title, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9
2016-02-10SenateHearing: 02/16/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 6
2016-02-01SenateIntroduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback