NH SB54 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/11; Chapter 0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/11; Chapter 0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of declarant under the condominium act and the duties of the committee to study laws relating to condominium and homeowners associations.
Title
Relative to the definition of declarant under the condominium act and the duties of the committee to study laws relating to condominium and homeowners associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/11; Chapter 0156 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1534 | |
2011-05-11 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1320-1321 | |
2011-05-03 | House Public Hearing: 5/10/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-04-27 | House Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 40, PG.1352 | |
2011-04-27 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1352 | |
2011-04-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 27 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1066 | |
2011-04-12 | House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/19/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 Banking/Business Div ==Work Session May Follow== | |
2011-03-31 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 35, PG.1240 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.239 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1311s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.235 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. De Blois Floor Amendment #2011-1311s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.235 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. De Blois moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 11, Pg.234 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.234 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/30/11 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Without Objection, President Bragdon moved to Special Order SB 54 to after lunch; Senate Journal 11, Pg.195 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Hearing: 2/1/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |