NH SB539 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2016; Chapter 0202; Effective 08/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2016; Chapter 0202; Effective 08/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to records under the child protection act.
Title
Relative to access to records under the child protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2016; Chapter 0202; Effective 08/05/2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 29 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 6 |
2016-04-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 6 |
2016-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-04-07 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2016 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-04-06 | House | Vacated and Referred to Children and Family Law (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 3 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1070s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1070s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016 Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1070s, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 03/01/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:10 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |