NH SB535 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-91 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-91 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a grant program for high schools for heroin and opiate prevention education.
Title
Establishing a grant program for high schools for heroin and opiate prevention education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-91 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 50 |
2016-04-20 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. D. Brown) 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 2 |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/20/2016 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 10 |
2016-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1175s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2016-1175s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Floor Amendment #2016-1160s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Pending Motion Sen. Soucy Floor Amendment #2016-1160s; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Floor Amendment #2016-1160s, Not Voted On; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/10/2016; Senate Journal 8 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/10/2016; Senate Calendar 9 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing: 02/16/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/21/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |