NH SB533 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the benefit of extended school recess.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the benefit of extended school recess.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. Becky Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1149s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 1 |